Manufacturer: Horwich Works
Builder | Horwich Works |
Order Date | 05/1897 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 11 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
414 | 511 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 05/1897 | 25/09/1954 | |
418 | 512 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 05/1897 | 20/12/1958 | |
419 | 513 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 05/1897 | 15/08/1960 | |
425 | 514 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 05/1897 | 19/10/1946 | |
439 | 515 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 05/1897 | 29/12/1951 | |
447 | 516 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 05/1897 | 02/11/1946 | |
451 | 517 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 05/1897 | 24/01/1961 | |
456 | 518 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 05/1897 | 12/04/1958 | |
457 | 519 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 06/1897 | 30/08/1952 | |
458 | 520 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 06/1897 | 15/12/1956 | |
459 | 521 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 06/1897 | 03/12/1949 | |
464 | 522 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 06/1897 | 08/1938 | |
465 | 523 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 06/1897 | 08/11/1958 | |
470 | 524 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 07/1897 | 08/1933 | |
479 | 525 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 07/1897 | 15/11/1952 | |
483 | 526 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 07/1897 | 09/04/1955 | |
486 | 527 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 07/1897 | 27/10/1951 | |
487 | 528 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 07/1897 | 03/01/1948 | |
489 | 529 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 08/1897 | 13/02/1954 | |
491 | 530 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 08/1897 | 12/04/1958 |