Manufacturer: Horwich Works
Builder | Horwich Works |
Order Date | 12/1897 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 11 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
508 | 551 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 12/1897 | 30/03/1946 | |
509 | 552 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 12/1897 | 20/07/1957 | |
510 | 553 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 01/1898 | 16/06/1956 | |
523 | 554 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 01/1898 | 08/1932 | |
524 | 555 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 01/1898 | 11/1933 | |
602 | 556 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 01/1898 | 11/1931 | |
609 | 557 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 01/1898 | 11/1933 | |
619 | 558 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 01/1898 | 07/1939 | |
620 | 559 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 01/1898 | 18/09/1948 | |
622 | 560 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 01/1898 | 08/1946 | |
648 | 561 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 02/1898 | 07/1935 | |
650 | 562 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 02/1898 | 24/04/1957 | |
662 | 563 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 02/1898 | 12/1931 | |
677 | 564 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 02/1898 | 15/10/1960 | |
682 | 565 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 02/1898 | 06/04/1957 | |
683 | 566 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 02/1898 | 12/1933 | |
684 | 567 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 02/1898 | 18/02/1956 | |
685 | 568 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 03/1898 | 02/05/1953 | |
690 | 569 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 03/1898 | 23/02/1946 | |
692 | 570 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 03/1898 | 06/1934 |