Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 167 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2332 Week
» 2332 Month
» 69194 Year
» 1734570 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Horwich Works



Order Details for Lot No: HO/34
Builder Horwich Works
Order Date 1898
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class 1008

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1361 571 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1898 07/1930  
1362 572 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1898 11/1938  
1367 573 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1898 09/1940  
1370 574 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1898 06/1946  
1371 575 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1898 11/08/1956  
1372 576 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1898 02/1936  
1373 577 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1898 12/1933  
1374 578 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1898 01/1934  
1375 579 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1898 12/1933  
1376 580 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1898 02/1950  
1377 581 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1898 09/1928  
1378 582 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1898 16/11/1959  
1379 583 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1895 20/12/1947  
1380 584 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1895 11/1930  
1381 585 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1898 06/1937  
1382 586 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1898 07/1950  
1383 587 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1898 16/08/1952  
1384 588 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1898 07/08/1948  
1385 589 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1898 04/12/1948  
1386 590 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1898 05/07/1952