Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 106 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4598 Week
» 29432 Month
» 63764 Year
» 1729140 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Horwich Works



Order Details for Lot No: HO/35
Builder Horwich Works
Order Date 1898
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class 1008

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1387 591 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1898 10/1946  
1388 592 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1898 02/1950  
1389 593 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1898 04/1940  
1390 594 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1898 23/02/1952  
1391 595 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1898 05/1955  
686 596 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1898 12/1933  
693 597 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1898 11/1929  
696 598 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1898 06/1946  
699 599 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 08/1898 02/1947  
701 600 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 08/1898 10/1939  
703 601 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 08/1898 10/05/1952  
721 602 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 08/1898 05/1949  
723 603 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 08/1898 12/1934  
724 604 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 08/1898 02/1951  
725 605 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 09/1898 02/1934  
728 606 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 09/1898 08/1935  
730 607 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 09/1898 03/10/1958  
732 608 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 09/1898 20/12/1947  
733 609 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 09/1898 06/1934  
734 610 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 09/1898 08/1944