Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 57 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4549 Week
» 29383 Month
» 63715 Year
» 1729091 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Horwich Works



Order Details for Lot No: HO/36
Builder Horwich Works
Order Date 1898
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class 1008

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
5 611 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 10/1898 11/1945  
34 612 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 10/1898 04/12/1948  
48 613 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 10/1898 07/1946  
90 614 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 10/1898 10/1938  
98 615 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 10/1898 01/1947  
120 616 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 10/1898 08/04/1950  
183 617 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 10/1898 01/1944  
191 618 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 11/1898 02/1939  
192 619 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 11/1898 12/04/1958  
267 620 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 11/1898 08/11/1947  
297 621 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 11/1898 01/1937  
316 622 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 11/1898 11/1958  
332 623 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 11/1898 19/06/1948  
346 624 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 12/1898 06/1939  
351 625 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 12/1898 02/1929  
353 626 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 12/1898 08/1936  
356 627 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 12/1898 21/08/1948  
371 628 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 12/1898 07/08/1948  
379 629 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 12/1898 08/1940  
380 630 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 12/1898 12/1945