Manufacturer: Horwich Works
Builder | Horwich Works |
Order Date | 10/1899 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 11 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
80 | 671 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 10/1899 | 12/1933 | |
152 | 672 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 11/1899 | 13/12/1952 | |
361 | 673 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 11/1899 | 03/1936 | |
393 | 674 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 11/1899 | 10/05/1958 | |
397 | 675 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 11/1899 | 15/03/1958 | |
409 | 676 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 11/1899 | 21/11/1959 | |
416 | 677 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 12/1899 | 25/08/1956 | |
421 | 678 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 12/1899 | 06/1938 | |
426 | 679 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 12/1899 | 10/1939 | |
446 | 680 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 12/1899 | 07/08/1954 | |
462 | 681 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 12/1899 | 03/1936 | |
468 | 682 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 12/1899 | 03/06/1961 | |
473 | 683 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 12/1899 | 12/1946 | |
485 | 684 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 01/1900 | 19/07/1947 | |
490 | 685 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 01/1900 | 12/1933 | |
492 | 686 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 01/1900 | 25/06/1955 | |
520 | 687 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 01/1900 | 06/1933 | |
526 | 688 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 02/1900 | 24/04/1958 | |
610 | 689 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 02/1900 | 10/11/1960 | |
681 | 690 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 02/1900 | 24/01/1948 |