Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 106 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3524 Week
» 28358 Month
» 62690 Year
» 1728066 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Horwich Works



Order Details for Lot No: HO/41
Builder Horwich Works
Order Date 1900
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class 1008

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
514 711 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 10/1900 17/01/1953  
515 712 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 11/1900 12/1936  
516 713 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 11/1900 11/1939  
525 714 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 11/1900 09/1958  
632 715 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 11/1900 08/1947  
641 716 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 11/1900 10/1944  
669 717 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 12/1900 20/12/1947  
689 718 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 12/1900 04/1940  
705 719 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 12/1900 28/11/1953  
707 720 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 12/1900 08/1938  
714 721 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 12/1900 10/1946  
716 722 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 12/1900 09/1938  
719 723 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 12/1900 18/12/1948  
722 724 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 01/1901 11/1938  
740 725 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 01/1901 04/1944  
741 726 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 01/1901 03/10/1958  
742 727 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 01/1901 07/1936  
743 728 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 02/1901 12/1938  
746 729 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 02/1901 09/1938  
790 730 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 02/1901 05/11/1955