Manufacturer: Horwich Works
Builder | Horwich Works |
Order Date | 09/1890 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 11 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1053 | 51 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 09/1890 | 05/02/1955 | |
1054 | 52 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 09/1890 | 01/1934 | |
1055 | 53 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 10/1890 | 02/1947 | |
1056 | 54 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 10/1890 | 05/1932 | |
1057 | 55 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 10/1890 | 31/10/1953 | |
1058 | 56 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 10/1890 | 14/01/1956 | |
1059 | 57 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 10/1890 | 15/09/1951 | |
1060 | 58 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 10/1890 | 23/03/1946 | |
1061 | 59 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 11/1890 | 24/01/1953 | |
1062 | 60 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 11/1890 | 07/05/1949 | |
1063 | 61 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 11/1890 | 03/03/1956 | |
1064 | 62 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 11/1890 | 25/04/1953 | |
1065 | 63 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 12/1890 | 01/1947 | |
1066 | 64 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 12/1890 | 07/03/1953 | |
1067 | 65 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 12/1890 | 24/10/1959 | |
1068 | 66 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 12/1890 | 01/1940 | |
1069 | 67 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 12/1890 | 27/05/1950 | |
1070 | 68 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 12/1890 | 10/03/1951 | |
1071 | 69 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 01/1891 | 08/09/1951 | |
1072 | 70 | 11 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0 | 01/1891 | 11/1933 |