Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 136 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1205 Week
» 1205 Month
» 68067 Year
» 1733443 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Horwich Works



Order Details for Lot No: HO/51
Builder Horwich Works
Order Date 1905
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class 1008

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
816 901 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1905 05/1943  
817 902 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1905 06/1946  
819 903 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1905 22/03/1952  
833 904 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1905 01/03/1952  
839 905 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1905 08/1946  
842 906 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1905 22/05/1948  
867 907 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 05/1905 03/1946  
868 908 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1905 05/1931  
869 909 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1905 03/1945  
878 910 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1905 05/1946  
1461 911 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1905 01/1946  
1462 912 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 06/1905 10/1949  
1463 913 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1905 06/1946  
1464 914 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1905 08/1944  
1465 915 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1905 10/1944  
1466 916 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 07/1905 11/1944  
1467 917 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 08/1905 10/1947  
1468 918 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 09/1905 29/12/1951  
1469 919 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 09/1905 19/10/1946  
1470 920 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 10/1905 14/12/1957