Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 115 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3533 Week
» 28367 Month
» 62699 Year
» 1728075 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Horwich Works



Order Details for Lot No: HO/64
Builder Horwich Works
Order Date 1909
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class 1008

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1526 1072 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 01/1910 03/1946  
1527 1073 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 01/1910 10/1949  
1528 1074 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 01/1910 03/1947  
1529 1075 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 02/1910 10/1929  
1530 1076 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 02/1910 03/1945  
1531 1077 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 02/1910 04/03/1950  
1532 1078 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 02/1910 05/1942  
1533 1079 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 02/1910 14/08/1948  
1534 1080 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 02/1910 07/1946  
1535 1081 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1910 05/1952  
1536 1082 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1910 09/08/1952  
1537 1083 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1910 29/04/1950  
1538 1084 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1910 08/1931  
1539 1085 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1910 03/1928  
1540 1086 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1910 04/1932  
1541 1087 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 03/1910 04/12/1948  
1542 1088 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1910 11/1945  
1543 1089 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1910 01/1949  
1544 1090 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1910 23/02/1952  
1545 1091 1008 LYR Aspinall 2-4-2T 04/1910 23/10/1948