Manufacturer: Horwich Works
Builder | Horwich Works |
Order Date | 07/1913 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 1546 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1566 | 1194 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 07/1913 | 08/1938 | |
1567 | 1195 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 07/1913 | 09/11/1946 | |
1568 | 1196 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 08/1913 | 04/1932 | |
1569 | 1197 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 08/1913 | 08/1931 | |
1570 | 1198 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 09/1913 | 05/1935 | |
1571 | 1199 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 09/1913 | 03/1937 | |
1572 | 1200 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 09/1913 | 04/1936 | |
1573 | 1201 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 10/1913 | 09/1931 | |
1574 | 1202 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 10/1913 | 11/1935 | |
1575 | 1203 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 10/1913 | 06/1934 | |
1576 | 1204 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 11/1913 | 22/09/1951 | |
1577 | 1205 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 11/1913 | 01/1936 | |
1578 | 1206 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 11/1913 | 04/1932 | |
1579 | 1207 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 12/1913 | 08/05/1948 | |
1580 | 1208 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 12/1913 | 06/1931 | |
1581 | 1209 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 12/1913 | 09/03/1946 | |
1582 | 1210 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 12/1913 | 10/1934 | |
1583 | 1211 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 01/1914 | 02/10/1948 | |
1584 | 1212 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 01/1914 | 02/1937 | |
1585 | 1213 | 1546 | LYR | Hughes | 0-8-0 | 02/1914 | 12/1935 |