Manufacturer: Horwich Works
Builder | Horwich Works |
Order Date | 08/1897 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 1351 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1351 | 531 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 08/1897 | 1917 | |
1352 | 532 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 09/1897 | 09/1926 | |
1353 | 533 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 09/1897 | 02/1928 | |
1354 | 534 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 09/1897 | 12/1914 | |
1355 | 535 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 09/1897 | 01/09/1956 | |
1356 | 536 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 09/1897 | 02/01/1954 | |
1357 | 537 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 10/1897 | 1917 | |
1358 | 538 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 10/1897 | 21/09/1961 | |
1359 | 539 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 10/1897 | 12/1932 | |
1360 | 540 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 10/1897 | 09/1926 | |
493 | 541 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 10/1897 | 12/1914 | |
494 | 542 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 11/1897 | 01/1931 | |
495 | 543 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 11/1897 | 07/1926 | |
496 | 544 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 11/1897 | 01/1931 | |
499 | 545 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 11/1897 | 12/1932 | |
601 | 546 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 11/1897 | 07/06/1959 | |
503 | 547 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 11/1897 | 1914 | |
505 | 548 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 12/1897 | 03/1936 | |
506 | 549 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 12/1897 | 17/01/1959 | |
507 | 550 | 1351 | LYR | Aspinall | 0-6-0T | 12/1897 | 12/1914 |