Manufacturer: Kitson
Builder | Kitson |
Order Date | 1921 |
For | 25 Steam locomotives |
Class | K2 |
Information | DN 295 1/1921 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1680 | 5330 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 06/1921 | 08/07/1959 | |
1681 | 5331 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 06/1921 | 16/12/1960 | |
1682 | 5332 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 06/1921 | 25/11/1959 | |
1683 | 5333 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 06/1921 | 23/12/1960 | |
1684 | 5334 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 06/1921 | 16/04/1958 | |
1685 | 5335 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 06/1921 | 02/05/1958 | |
1686 | 5336 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 06/1921 | 23/03/1959 | |
1687 | 5337 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 06/1921 | 11/05/1959 | |
1688 | 5338 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 07/1921 | 09/10/1959 | |
1689 | 5339 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 07/1921 | 13/05/1960 | |
1690 | 5340 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 07/1921 | 21/10/1959 | |
1691 | 5341 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 07/1921 | 12/12/1958 | |
1692 | 5342 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 07/1921 | 13/06/1960 | |
1693 | 5343 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 07/1921 | 17/06/1959 | |
1694 | 5344 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 07/1921 | 24/03/1961 | |
1695 | 5345 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 07/1921 | 23/04/1959 | |
1696 | 5346 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 07/1921 | 07/12/1959 | |
1697 | 5347 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1921 | 29/10/1959 | |
1698 | 5348 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1921 | 26/06/1961 | |
1699 | 5349 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1921 | 30/09/1959 | |
1700 | 5350 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1921 | 03/11/1959 | |
1701 | 5351 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1921 | 22/03/1960 | |
1702 | 5352 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1921 | 02/09/1960 | |
1703 | 5353 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 08/1921 | 11/02/1959 | |
1704 | 5354 | K2 | GNR | Gresley | 2-6-0 | 09/1921 | 29/07/1960 |