Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Lot Number | Order Number | Order Date | For | Company | Class | Wheels | Number Off | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4468E | 06/1903 | Steam Locomotives | LTSR | Tilbury tanks | 0-6-2T | 6 | ||
L100 | 17/07/1958 | Diesel Locomotives | BR | 43 | 33 | Hyde Park Works | ||
L101 | 1958 | Diesel Locomotives | BR | D3/1 | 3 | Queen's Park Works | ||
L102 | 1958 | Diesel Locomotives | BR | D2/10 | 36 | Queen's Park Works | ||
L130 | 1905 | Steam Locomotives | GCR | C4 | 4-4-2 | 12 | Hyde Park Works | |
L167 | 01/1906 | Steam Locomotives | NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 10 | Atlas Works | |
L17 | 1903 | Steam Locomotives | FR | L3 | 0-6-2T | 5 | ||
L175 | 07/1906 | Steam Locomotives | NBR | C10 | 4-4-2 | 14 | ||
L177 | 04/1906 | Steam Locomotives | HR | C | 4-4-0 | 3 | ||
L215 | 1906 | Steam Locomotives | FR | L3 | 0-6-2T | 6 | ||
L220 | 1906 | Steam Locomotives | FR | D4 | 0-6-0 | 4 | ||
L226 | 1907 | Steam Locomotives | GSWR | 361 | 0-6-0 | 12 | ||
L265 | 1907 | Steam Locomotives | HR | U | 4-4-0 | 4 | ||
L268 | 1907 | Steam Locomotives | MCR | 18 | 0-6-0 | 1 | ||
L281 | 1907 | Steam Locomotives | NER | J27 | 0-6-0 | 20 | ||
L298 | 1908 | Steam Locomotives | LTSR | Tilbury tanks | 0-6-2T | 4 | ||
L335 | 1908 | Steam Locomotives | HR | U | 4-4-0 | 2 | ||
L336 | 1908 | Steam Locomotives | HR | X | 0-6-4T | 4 | ||
L344 | 1909 | Steam Locomotives | NBR | D29 | 4-4-0 | 6 | Hyde Park Works | |
L345 | 1909 | Steam Locomotives | NBR | N14 | 0-6-2T | 6 | Hyde Park Works | |
L346 | 1909 | Steam Locomotives | NBR | G9 | 0-4-4T | 12 | ||
L347 | 01/1909 | Steam Locomotives | NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 10 | Queen's Park Works | |
L357 | 08/1909 | Steam Locomotives | NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 10 | Atlas Works | |
L382 | 01/1910 | Steam Locomotives | NBR | J35 | 0-6-0 | 10 | Hyde Park Works | |
L394 | 1910 | Steam Locomotives | NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 18 | The first six engines had westinghouse brakes and were classified by the LNER as N15/2. The remaining 12 were Steam braked and were N15/1. Hyde Park Works. | |
L436 | 1911 | Steam Locomotives | NER | C7 | 4-4-2 | 10 | ||
L437 | 1911 | Steam Locomotives | NER | C7 | 4-4-2 | 10 | ||
L44 | 1952 | Diesel Locomotives | BR | D2/1 | 6 | Built in-house by NBL at Queen's Park Works - sold to BR. | ||
L492 | 1912 | Steam Locomotives | NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 20 | Queens Park Works | |
L496 | 01/1912 | Steam Locomotives | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 50 | Hyde Park Works | |
L528 | 1913 | Steam Locomotives | NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 9 | Queens Park Works | |
L652 | 01/1915 | Steam Locomotives | NBR | C16 | 4-4-2T | 15 | Atlas Works | |
L653 | 1916 | Steam Locomotives | NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 12 | Atlas Works | |
L664 | 1915 | Steam Locomotives | BR | 10 | Atlas Works | |||
L689 | 14/02/1917 | Steam Locomotives | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 41 | Queen's Park Works Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort |
|
L692 | 06/06/1917 | Steam Locomotives | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 50 | Hyde Park Works Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort |
|
L693 | 06/06/1917 | Steam Locomotives | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 50 | Queen's Park Works Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort |
|
L695 | 05/1918 | Steam Locomotives | NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 34 | Atlas Works | |
L698 | 1918 | Steam Locomotives | GNR | K2 | 2-6-0 | 10 | Hyde Park Works | |
L699 | 1918 | Steam Locomotives | GNR | K2 | 2-6-0 | 10 | Queen's Park Works | |
L703 | 09/04/1918 | Steam Locomotives | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 30 | Hyde Park Works Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort |
|
L704 | 09/04/1918 | Steam Locomotives | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 30 | Queen's Park Works Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort |
|
L705 | 04/1918 | Steam Locomotives | GNR | O3 | 2-8-0 | 10 | Hyde Park Works | |
L707 | 1918 | Steam Locomotives | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 14 | Atlas Works Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort |
|
L709 | 08/1918 | Steam Locomotives | GNR | O3 | 2-8-0 | 5 | Atlas Works | |
L710 | 23/08/1918 | Steam Locomotives | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 12 | Hyde Park Works Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort |
|
L711 | 23/08/1918 | Steam Locomotives | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 12 | Queen's Park Works Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort |
|
L712 | 24/10/1918 | Steam Locomotives | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 50 | Hyde Park Works Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort |
|
L713 | 24/10/1918 | Steam Locomotives | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 50 | Queen's Park Works Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort |
|
L714 | 24/10/1918 | Steam Locomotives | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 30 | Atlas Works Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort |
|
L716 | 10/1919 | Steam Locomotives | NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 20 | Atlas Works | |
L717 | 1920 | Steam Locomotives | NBR | N15 | 0-6-2T | 10 | Atlas Works | |
L730 | 1920 | Steam Locomotives | GNSR | D40 | 4-4-0 | 6 | ||
L734 | 1920 | Steam Locomotives | GNR | N2 | 0-6-2T | 50 | N2/1 | |
L739 | 11/1920 | Steam Locomotives | NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 15 | Atlas Works | |
L740 | 01/1921 | Steam Locomotives | NBR | C16 | 4-4-2T | 6 | Atlas Works | |
L741 | 1921 | Steam Locomotives | NBR | C11 | 4-4-2 | 2 | ||
L742 | 04/1920 | Steam Locomotives | GNR | O2 | 2-8-0 | 10 | Without tenders | |
L76 | 16/11/1955 | Diesel Locomotives | BR | D20/2 | 5 | Queens Park | ||
L768 | 11/1922 | Steam Locomotives | BR | |||||
L77 | 1955 | Diesel Locomotives | BR | 22 | 6 | BTC Pilot scheme locomotives. Built at Queen's Park Works | ||
L78 | 1955 | Diesel Locomotives | BR | 16 | 10 | Part of the BTC Pilot order. Built at Queen's Park Works | ||
L787 | 12/1923 | Steam Locomotives | GNR | A1 | 4-6-2 | 20 | Hyde Park Works | |
13 | L788 | 1924 | Steam Locomotives | LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 15 | |
L79 | 1955 | Diesel Locomotives | BR | 21 | 10 | Part of the BTC Pilot Order. Built at Queen's Park Works. | ||
18 | L801 | 1925 | Steam Locomotives | LMS | Compound | 4-4-0 | 25 | |
L81 | 1955 | Diesel Locomotives | BR | D2/10 | 12 | Queen's Park Works | ||
34 | L819 | 1926 | Steam Locomotives | LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 30 | |
34 | L820 | 1926 | Steam Locomotives | LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 30 | |
L852 | 1928 | Steam Locomotives | GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 25 | Hyde Park Works | |
L853 | 1928 | Steam Locomotives | GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 25 | Queen's Park Works | |
L88 | 1956 | Diesel Locomotives | BR | D3/1 | 12 | Queen's Park Works | ||
L885 | 11/1933 | Steam Locomotives | LMS | 6P | 4-6-0 | 50 | Hyde Park and Queen's Park works (25 each) | |
L890 | 01/1935 | Steam Locomotives | GNR | K3 | 2-6-0 | 20 | Hyde Park Works | |
L896 | 12/1935 | Steam Locomotives | BR | 73 | Hyde Park Works | |||
L91 | 1957 | Electric Locomotives | AL4 | 10 | Ordered by GEC for the British Transport Commission. Built at Hyde Park Works. | |||
L93 | 1957 | Diesel Locomotives | BR | D2/10 | 25 | Queen's Park Works | ||
L94 | 01/05/1957 | Diesel Locomotives | BR | 21 | 48 | Hyde Park Works - originally, this order was for 28 locomotives with a further 20 being added to the order. | ||
L943 | 1942 | Steam Locomotives | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 545 | ||
L945 | 06/1943 | Steam Locomotives | WD | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 100 | Hyde Park | |
L948 | 03/1943 | Steam Locomotives | WD | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 50 | Hyde Park | |
L958 | 08/1945 | Steam Locomotives | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 100 | ||
L963 | 01/1946 | Steam Locomotives | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 150 | ||
L97 | 05/11/1957 | Diesel Locomotives | BR | 22 | 52 | Queens Park | ||
L977 | 1947 | Diesel Locomotives | BR | 10800 | 1 | Queen's Park Works - ordered by the LMS in late 1947. | ||
L981 | 07/1947 | Steam Locomotives | LNER | L1 | 2-6-4T | 35 | Queen's Park Works | |
L982 | 07/1947 | Steam Locomotives | LNER | K1 | 2-6-0 | 70 | Queen's Park Works | |
L997 | 09/1948 | Steam Locomotives | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 40 | ||
Unknown | 1922 | Steam Locomotives | GSWR | 540 | 4-6-4T | 6 | ||
Unknown | Steam Locomotives | BR | 10 | |||||
Unknown | 1903 | Steam Locomotives | GSWR | 381 | 4-6-0 | 10 | ||
Unknown | 1911 | Steam Locomotives | GSWR | 381 | 4-6-0 | 2 | ||
Unknown | 1910 | Steam Locomotives | GSWR | 17 | 0-6-0 | 15 | ||
Unknown | 1913 | Steam Locomotives | GSWR | 131 | 4-4-0 | 6 | ||
Unknown | 1913 | Steam Locomotives | GSWR | 279 | 0-6-0 | 15 | ||
Unknown | 1917 | Steam Locomotives | GSWR | 403 | 2-6-0 | 11 | ||
Unknown | 1917 | Steam Locomotives | GSWR | 5 | 0-6-0T | 3 | ||
Unknown | 1915 | Steam Locomotives | GSWR | 45 | 0-6-2T | 6 | ||
Unknown | 1917 | Steam Locomotives | GSWR | 45 | 0-6-2T | 12 | ||
Unknown | 1919 | Steam Locomotives | GSWR | 1 | 0-6-2T | 10 | ||
Unknown | 1916 | Steam Locomotives | HR | Loch | 4-4-0 | 3 | ||
Unknown | 1911 | Steam Locomotives | HR | X | 0-6-4T | 4 | ||
Unknown | 07/1907 | Steam Locomotives | HR | K | 0-6-0 | 2 | ||
Unknown | 0000 | Steam Locomotives | FR | K4 | 4-4-0 | 2 | ||
Unknown | 0000 | Steam Locomotives | FR | K4 | 4-4-0 | 2 | ||
Unknown | 0000 | Steam Locomotives | FR | D5 | 0-6-0 | 6 | ||
Unknown | 0000 | Steam Locomotives | FR | D5 | 0-6-0 | 4 | ||
Unknown | 0000 | Steam Locomotives | FR | D5 | 0-6-0 | 5 | ||
Unknown | 1916 | Steam Locomotives | CR | 113 | 4-4-0 | 10 | ||
Unknown | 1922 | Steam Locomotives | CR | 72 | 4-4-0 | 12 | ||
Unknown | 1922 | Steam Locomotives | CR | 191 | 4-6-0 | 8 | ||
Unknown | 1917 | Steam Locomotives | CR | 944 | 4-6-2T | 12 | ||
Unknown | 1930 | Steam Locomotives | GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 25 | ||
Unknown | 1929 | Steam Locomotives | GWR | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 25 |