Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 1130 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7813 Week
» 18859 Month
» 18859 Year
» 1684235 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L281
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 1907
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class J27

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1014 18355 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1908 23/12/1963  
1015 18356 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1908 09/09/1967  
1017 18357 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1908 05/06/1967  
1022 18358 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1908 24/05/1967  
1023 18359 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1908 29/06/1966  
1024 18360 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1908 21/11/1966  
1025 18361 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1908 14/10/1959  
1027 18362 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1908 01/05/1967  
1028 18363 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1908 30/07/1962  
1029 18364 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1908 09/1966  
1030 18365 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1908 06/05/1963  
1034 18366 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1908 27/02/1966  
1035 18367 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1908 01/03/1965  
1036 18368 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1908 20/03/1967  
1039 18369 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1908 11/1959  
1040 18370 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1908 07/06/1966  
1044 18371 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1908 26/08/1959  
1046 18372 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1908 03/07/1959  
1047 18373 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1908 05/1964  
1048 18374 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1908 30/03/1959