Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 01/1912 |
For | 50 Steam locomotives |
Class | O4 |
Information | Hyde Park Works |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1203 | 19859 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 08/1912 | 29/08/1963 | |
1204 | 19860 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 08/1912 | 19/09/1941 | |
1205 | 19861 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 08/1912 | 09/12/1962 | |
1206 | 19862 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 08/1912 | 09/06/1962 | |
1207 | 19863 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 08/1912 | 16/04/1959 | |
1208 | 19864 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 08/1912 | 24/11/1961 | |
1209 | 19865 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 08/1912 | 18/06/1959 | |
1210 | 19866 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 08/1912 | 16/03/1962 | |
1211 | 19867 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 08/1912 | 03/03/1963 | |
1212 | 19868 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 08/1912 | 10/09/1941 | |
1213 | 19869 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 08/1912 | 18/10/1964 | |
1214 | 19870 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 09/1912 | 27/10/1962 | |
1215 | 19871 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 09/1912 | 22/02/1952 | |
1216 | 19872 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 09/1912 | 17/11/1962 | |
1217 | 19873 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 09/1912 | 19/09/1941 | |
1218 | 19874 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 09/1912 | 27/02/1959 | |
1219 | 19875 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 10/1912 | 24/11/1961 | |
1220 | 19876 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 10/1912 | 17/03/1963 | |
1221 | 19877 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 10/1912 | 03/11/1962 | |
1222 | 19878 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 10/1912 | 22/02/1952 | |
1223 | 19879 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 10/1912 | 22/12/1961 | |
1224 | 19880 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 10/1912 | 13/12/1964 | |
1225 | 19881 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 11/1912 | 14/09/1941 | |
1226 | 19882 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 11/1912 | 27/04/1961 | |
1227 | 19883 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 11/1912 | 23/09/1962 | |
1228 | 19884 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 11/1912 | 03/11/1962 | |
1229 | 19885 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 11/1912 | 29/11/1963 | |
1230 | 19886 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 11/1912 | 18/10/1941 | |
1231 | 19887 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 11/1912 | 17/11/1962 | |
1232 | 19888 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 11/1912 | 24/11/1962 | |
1233 | 19889 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 11/1912 | 19/09/1941 | |
1234 | 19890 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 11/1912 | 10/02/1959 | |
1235 | 19891 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 11/1912 | 04/10/1941 | |
1236 | 19892 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 11/1912 | 30/06/1959 | |
1237 | 19893 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 11/1912 | 08/08/1962 | |
1238 | 19894 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 12/1912 | 19/09/1941 | |
1239 | 19895 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 12/1912 | 21/09/1941 | |
1240 | 19896 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 12/1912 | 23/09/1962 | |
1241 | 19897 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 12/1912 | 08/08/1962 | |
1242 | 19898 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 12/1912 | 11/07/1965 | |
1243 | 19899 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 12/1912 | 11/07/1965 | |
1244 | 19900 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 12/1912 | 17/11/1962 | |
1245 | 19901 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 12/1912 | 23/07/1963 | |
1246 | 19902 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 12/1912 | 03/10/1965 | |
1247 | 19903 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 12/1912 | 04/10/1941 | |
1248 | 19904 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 12/1912 | 21/04/1961 | |
1249 | 19905 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 12/1912 | 29/08/1963 | |
1250 | 19906 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 12/1912 | 18/05/1961 | |
1251 | 19907 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 01/1913 | 04/10/1941 | |
1252 | 19908 | O4 | GCR | Robinson | 2-8-0 | 01/1913 | 09/02/1962 |