Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 94 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2259 Week
» 2259 Month
» 69121 Year
» 1734497 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L693
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 06/06/1917
For 50 Steam locomotives
Class O4
Information Queen's Park Works
Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1892 21869 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1918 12/03/1959  
1894 21871 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1918 05/09/1965  
1895 21872 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1918 27/10/1962  
1896 21873 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1918 09/05/1965  
1898 21875 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1918 03/11/1962  
1899 21876 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1918 30/10/1963  
1902 21879 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 27/10/1962  
1903 21880 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 13/09/1941  
1904 21881 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 24/05/1962  
1905 21882 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 05/10/1941  
1907 21884 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 16/05/1964  
1908 21885 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 03/1918 16/07/1963  
1910 21887 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1918 23/06/1964  
1911 21888 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1918 19/09/1941  
1913 21890 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 04/1918 11/12/1959  
1914 21891 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 14/09/1941  
1915 21892 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 24/11/1962  
1916 21893 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 25/09/1964  
1917 21894 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 17/11/1962  
1920 21897 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 04/10/1941  
1921 21898 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 18/10/1941  
1922 21899 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 05/1918 09/09/1941  
1923 21900 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918 08/05/1959  
1925 21902 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918 07/03/1965  
1927 21904 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918 19/09/1941  
1928 21905 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918 04/10/1941  
1929 21906 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 06/1918 15/01/1966  
1933 21910 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1918 17/11/1962  
1936 21913 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1918 17/04/1966  
1937 21914 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 07/1918 07/11/1965  
1939 21916 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 08/1918 20/09/1941