Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 454 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6065 Week
» 17111 Month
» 17111 Year
» 1682487 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L704
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 09/04/1918
For 30 Steam locomotives
Class O4
Information Queen's Park Works
Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1975 22033 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918 13/10/1941  
1976 22034 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918 23/02/1959  
1978 22036 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1918 29/04/1964  
1979 22037 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1918 29/12/1962  
1981 22039 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1918 27/10/1962  
1991 22049 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1918 03/04/1959  
1993 22051 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1919 18/09/1963  
1995 22053 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1919 01/03/1964  
1998 22056 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1919 04/04/1965  
2000 22058 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1919 07/11/1965  
2001 22059 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1919 19/09/1941