Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 557 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1465 Week
» 12610 Month
» 112395 Year
» 1777771 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L705
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 04/1918
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class O3
Information Hyde Park Works

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
462 22060 O3 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 04/1919 26/03/1951  
463 22061 O3 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 04/1919 02/04/1951  
464 22062 O3 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 05/1919 21/01/1952  
465 22063 O3 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 05/1919 02/04/1951  
466 22064 O3 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 05/1919 16/12/1952  
467 22065 O3 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 06/1919 26/09/1951  
468 22066 O3 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 06/1919 05/02/1951  
469 22067 O3 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 06/1919 04/07/1947  
470 22068 O3 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 06/1919 22/02/1952  
471 22069 O3 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 06/1919 22/07/1948