Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 1920 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | N15 |
Information | Atlas Works |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 22278 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 02/1920 | 31/07/1959 | |
22 | 22279 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 02/1920 | 08/12/1959 | |
29 | 22280 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 02/1920 | 01/10/1962 | |
49 | 22281 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 02/1920 | 18/04/1958 | |
96 | 22282 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 02/1920 | 16/08/1960 | |
97 | 22283 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 02/1920 | 01/10/1962 | |
106 | 22284 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 02/1920 | 02/03/1959 | |
107 | 22285 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 03/1920 | 07/08/1958 | |
108 | 22286 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 03/1920 | 22/10/1960 | |
240 | 22287 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 03/1920 | 14/03/1958 |