Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 648 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1556 Week
» 12701 Month
» 112486 Year
» 1777862 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow



Order Details for Lot No: NB/L742
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Date 04/1920
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class O2
Information Without tenders
Administration Doncaster Works order #EO288

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
477 22691 O2 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 04/1921 05/11/1962  
478 22692 O2 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 04/1921 29/12/1962  
479 22693 O2 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 06/1921 03/11/1963  
480 22694 O2 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 06/1921 08/09/1963  
481 22695 O2 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 06/1921 22/09/1963  
482 22696 O2 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 06/1921 22/09/1963  
483 22697 O2 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 07/1921 08/09/1963  
484 22698 O2 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 07/1921 09/07/1962  
485 22699 O2 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 07/1921 29/12/1962  
486 22700 O2 GNR Gresley 2-8-0 07/1921 22/09/1963