Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 1942 |
For | 545 Steam locomotives |
Class | WD/8 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
7389 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1943 | 06/1955 | |||
7352 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 26/09/1965 | |||
813 | 24891 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 08/06/1967 | ||
814 | 24892 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 09/09/1967 | ||
815 | 24893 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 06/05/1963 | ||
816 | 24894 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 16/09/1963 | ||
817 | 24895 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 13/06/1964 | ||
818 | 24896 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 18/05/1963 | ||
819 | 24897 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 10/1956 | ||
820 | 24898 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 27/08/1957 | ||
829 | 24899 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 01/07/1967 | ||
830 | 24900 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 28/12/1963 | ||
831 | 24901 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 04/04/1965 | ||
832 | 24902 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 11/06/1962 | ||
833 | 24903 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 17/08/1964 | ||
834 | 24904 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 04/1964 | ||
835 | 24905 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 12/1953 | ||
836 | 24906 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 04/1964 | ||
837 | 24907 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 27/06/1967 | ||
838 | 24908 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 13/09/1965 | ||
839 | 24909 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 11/11/1963 | ||
840 | 24910 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 07/01/1960 | ||
841 | 24911 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 17/04/1966 | ||
851 | 24912 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 30/11/1963 | ||
853 | 24913 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 21/01/1967 | ||
842 | 24914 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 15/01/1964 | ||
854 | 24915 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 30/01/1966 | ||
843 | 24916 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 16/01/1965 | ||
844 | 24917 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 28/03/1964 | ||
845 | 24918 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 09/05/1964 | ||
846 | 24919 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 24/05/1963 | ||
847 | 24920 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 05/10/1964 | ||
848 | 24921 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 10/07/1966 | ||
850 | 24922 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 19/12/1965 | ||
849 | 24923 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 27/09/1965 | ||
852 | 24924 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 22/04/1967 | ||
855 | 24925 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 12/1955 | ||
856 | 24926 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 09/1953 | ||
857 | 24927 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1944 | 25/10/1965 | ||
858 | 24928 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1944 | 27/12/1965 | ||
859 | 24929 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1944 | 18/11/1963 | ||
860 | 24930 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1944 | 09/11/1963 | ||
861 | 24931 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1944 | 11/1949 | ||
862 | 24932 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1944 | 07/1957 | ||
863 | 24933 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1944 | 02/1958 | ||
864 | 24934 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1944 | 09/01/1966 | ||
865 | 24935 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 09/01/1967 | ||
866 | 24936 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 16/11/1963 | ||
867 | 24937 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 01/07/1967 | ||
869 | 24938 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 03/1956 | ||
871 | 24939 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 11/07/1965 | ||
872 | 24940 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 09/09/1967 | ||
873 | 24941 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 01/1954 | ||
874 | 24942 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 15/07/1965 | ||
875 | 24943 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 07/11/1965 | ||
876 | 24944 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 21/12/1963 | ||
877 | 24945 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 20/11/1964 | ||
878 | 24946 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 24/06/1967 | ||
879 | 24947 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 09/1953 | ||
8511 | 24948 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 04/1955 | ||
8512 | 24949 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/09/1944 | 05/12/1965 | ||
8513 | 24950 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 28/12/1959 | ||
8514 | 24951 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 20/06/1965 | ||
7281 | 24952 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 17/01/1964 | ||
7282 | 24953 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 11/1949 | ||
7283 | 24954 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 24/06/1967 | ||
7284 | 24955 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 27/02/1966 | ||
7285 | 24956 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 22/02/1965 | ||
7286 | 24957 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 10/10/1964 | ||
7287 | 24958 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 01/1954 | ||
7288 | 24959 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 12/11/1962 | ||
7289 | 24960 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 12/11/1962 | ||
7290 | 24961 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 24/06/1967 | ||
7291 | 24962 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 13/09/1966 | ||
7292 | 24963 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 25/11/1963 | ||
7293 | 24964 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 09/1953 | ||
7294 | 24965 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 19/09/1964 | ||
7295 | 24966 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 04/1957 | ||
7296 | 24967 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 09/09/1967 | ||
7297 | 24968 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 24/04/1967 | ||
7298 | 24969 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 24/07/1966 | ||
7299 | 24970 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 24/06/1967 | ||
7000 | 24971 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 25/01/1943 | 16/05/1964 | ||
7001 | 24972 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/02/1943 | 12/10/1963 | ||
7002 | 24973 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1943 | 17/04/1966 | ||
7003 | 24974 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1943 | 21/11/1965 | ||
7004 | 24975 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1943 | 12/02/1966 | ||
7005 | 24976 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 17/02/1943 | 29/12/1962 | ||
7006 | 24977 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1943 | 16/09/1962 | ||
7007 | 24978 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1943 | 16/11/1963 | ||
7008 | 24979 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1943 | 01/08/1965 | ||
7009 | 24980 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1943 | 06/06/1965 | ||
7010 | 24981 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 04/1964 | ||
7011 | 24982 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 10/1957 | ||
7012 | 24983 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1943 | 07/03/1964 | ||
7013 | 24984 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1943 | 06/04/1964 | ||
7014 | 24985 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 26/03/1943 | 10/01/1967 | ||
7015 | 24986 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1943 | 04/09/1966 | ||
7016 | 24987 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1943 | 07/07/1964 | ||
7017 | 24988 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1943 | 09/05/1965 | ||
7018 | 24989 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1943 | 27/06/1967 | ||
7019 | 24990 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1943 | 20/01/1967 | ||
7300 | 24990 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1943 | 25/06/1964 | ||
7020 | 24991 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1943 | 25/11/1963 | ||
7021 | 24992 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1943 | 17/04/1966 | ||
7022 | 24993 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1943 | 17/01/1965 | ||
7023 | 24994 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1943 | 04/04/1965 | ||
7024 | 24995 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1943 | 20/06/1965 | ||
7025 | 24996 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 27/09/1965 | ||
7026 | 24997 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 27/03/1965 | ||
7027 | 24998 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/04/1943 | 21/06/1965 | ||
7028 | 24999 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 17/07/1965 | ||
7029 | 25000 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 03/01/1967 | ||
7030 | 25001 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 26/10/1964 | ||
7031 | 25002 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 05/11/1962 | ||
7032 | 25003 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 06/1964 | ||
7033 | 25004 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 28/12/1963 | ||
7034 | 25005 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 17/10/1965 | ||
7035 | 25006 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 21/03/1965 | ||
7036 | 25007 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 10/04/1967 | ||
7037 | 25008 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 17/10/1965 | ||
7038 | 25009 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 06/1955 | ||
7039 | 25010 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 30/07/1962 | ||
7040 | 25011 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/05/1943 | 09/09/1967 | ||
7041 | 25012 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 11/04/1965 | ||
7042 | 25013 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 22/12/1962 | ||
7043 | 25014 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 12/1954 | ||
7044 | 25015 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 28/03/1964 | ||
7045 | 25016 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 09/1954 | ||
7046 | 25017 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 25/04/1965 | ||
7047 | 25018 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 02/05/1965 | ||
7048 | 25019 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 19/09/1964 | ||
7049 | 25020 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 21/05/1943 | 22/02/1964 | ||
7150 | 25021 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 12/12/1965 | ||
7151 | 25022 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 25/05/1943 | 30/05/1964 | ||
7152 | 25023 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 12/1963 | ||
7153 | 25024 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 03/1953 | ||
7154 | 25025 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 12/1956 | ||
7155 | 25026 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 23/06/1964 | ||
7156 | 25027 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 11/1949 | ||
7157 | 25028 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 13/06/1965 | ||
7158 | 25029 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 11/1949 | ||
7159 | 25030 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 09/1955 | ||
7160 | 25031 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 04/1964 | ||
7161 | 25032 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 27/03/1966 | ||
7162 | 25033 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 23/01/1966 | ||
7163 | 25034 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 16/09/1962 | ||
7164 | 25035 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 18/05/1963 | ||
7165 | 25036 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 22/05/1965 | ||
7166 | 25037 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 10/02/1966 | ||
7167 | 25038 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 17/04/1966 | ||
7168 | 25039 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 09/1954 | ||
7169 | 25040 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 09/01/1967 | ||
7170 | 25041 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 17/04/1966 | ||
7171 | 25042 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 04/07/1964 | ||
7172 | 25043 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 04/1955 | ||
7173 | 25044 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 19/12/1965 | ||
7174 | 25045 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 16/11/1963 | ||
7175 | 25046 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 08/06/1967 | ||
7176 | 25047 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 07/02/1964 | ||
7177 | 25048 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 01/1954 | ||
7178 | 25049 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 24/02/1964 | ||
7179 | 25050 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 29/12/1962 | ||
7180 | 25051 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 11/04/1965 | ||
7181 | 25052 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 25/04/1964 | ||
7182 | 25053 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 09/05/1965 | ||
7183 | 25054 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 01/1947 | ||
7184 | 25055 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 29/03/1962 | ||
7185 | 25056 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 22/08/1966 | ||
7186 | 25057 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 22/08/1965 | ||
7187 | 25058 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 07/1963 | ||
7188 | 25059 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 09/1954 | ||
7189 | 25060 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 09/1954 | ||
7190 | 25061 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 03/1956 | ||
7191 | 25062 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 06/1955 | ||
7192 | 25063 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 03/07/1965 | ||
7193 | 25064 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 10/1956 | ||
7194 | 25065 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 05/1955 | ||
7195 | 25066 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 24/06/1967 | ||
7196 | 25067 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 11/07/1964 | ||
7197 | 25068 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 05/1956 | ||
7198 | 25069 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 12/11/1962 | ||
7199 | 25070 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 04/1965 | ||
7200 | 25071 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 16/02/1963 | ||
7201 | 25072 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 06/1963 | ||
7202 | 25073 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 27/02/1966 | ||
7203 | 25074 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 25/04/1964 | ||
7204 | 25075 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 14/03/1965 | ||
7205 | 25076 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 08/05/1965 | ||
7206 | 25077 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 28/12/1963 | ||
7207 | 25078 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 29/08/1965 | ||
7208 | 25079 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 05/10/1964 | ||
7209 | 25080 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 14/03/1965 | ||
7210 | 25081 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 22/08/1963 | ||
7211 | 25082 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 24/02/1964 | ||
7212 | 25083 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 27/02/1966 | ||
7213 | 25084 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 17/04/1966 | ||
7214 | 25085 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 11/04/1965 | ||
7215 | 25086 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 14/11/1965 | ||
7216 | 25087 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 01/1954 | ||
7217 | 25088 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 04/1955 | ||
7218 | 25089 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 10/02/1966 | ||
7219 | 25090 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 12/1954 | ||
7220 | 25091 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 24/04/1967 | ||
7221 | 25092 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 05/02/1960 | ||
7222 | 25093 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 04/05/1963 | ||
7223 | 25094 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 06/1967 | ||
7224 | 25095 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 11/1949 | ||
7225 | 25096 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 19/08/1963 | ||
7226 | 25097 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 21/03/1964 | ||
7227 | 25098 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 03/10/1965 | ||
7228 | 25099 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 05/09/1962 | ||
7229 | 25100 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 04/1964 | ||
7230 | 25101 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 17/12/1962 | ||
7231 | 25102 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 24/11/1966 | ||
7232 | 25103 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 01/07/1967 | ||
7233 | 25104 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 12/11/1962 | ||
7234 | 25105 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 11/07/1964 | ||
7235 | 25106 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 11/04/1965 | ||
7236 | 25107 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 31/10/1962 | ||
7237 | 25108 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 17/10/1965 | ||
7238 | 25109 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 08/1945 | ||
7239 | 25110 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 19/06/1965 | ||
7240 | 25111 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 11/1954 | ||
25112 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1943 | 07/03/1964 | |||
25113 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1943 | 27/04/1963 | |||
25114 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1943 | 27/05/1963 | |||
7244 | 25115 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1943 | 10/1957 | ||
7245 | 25116 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1943 | 01/1954 | ||
7246 | 25117 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1943 | 12/1954 | ||
25118 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1943 | 22/05/1965 | |||
25119 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1943 | 01/01/1964 | |||
25120 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1943 | 06/1964 | |||
25121 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1943 | 29/12/1962 | |||
25122 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1943 | 04/07/1965 | |||
25123 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1943 | 01/07/1967 | |||
25124 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1943 | 18/07/1965 | |||
25125 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1943 | 17/04/1967 | |||
25126 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1943 | 15/08/1965 | |||
25127 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1943 | 13/02/1966 | |||
25128 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1943 | 07/03/1964 | |||
25129 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1943 | 04/1965 | |||
25130 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1943 | 07/1964 | |||
25131 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1943 | 21/06/1965 | |||
25132 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1943 | 25/04/1964 | |||
7262 | 25133 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 11/1949 | ||
7263 | 25134 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 24/10/1965 | ||
7264 | 25135 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1944 | 12/1953 | ||
7265 | 25136 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1944 | 21/02/1965 | ||
7266 | 25137 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1944 | 04/1957 | ||
7267 | 25138 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1944 | 11/1955 | ||
7268 | 25139 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1944 | 27/08/1957 | ||
7269 | 25140 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1944 | 03/1962 | ||
7270 | 25141 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1944 | 24/05/1967 | ||
7271 | 25142 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1944 | 09/09/1967 | ||
7272 | 25143 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 17/04/1966 | ||
7273 | 25144 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 09/1953 | ||
7274 | 25145 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 13/06/1965 | ||
7275 | 25146 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 12/1956 | ||
7276 | 25147 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 09/09/1967 | ||
7277 | 25148 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 06/05/1963 | ||
7278 | 25149 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 22/08/1966 | ||
7279 | 25150 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 27/11/1966 | ||
7280 | 25151 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 22/09/1967 | ||
7424 | 25152 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 26/09/1965 | ||
7425 | 25153 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 11/07/1965 | ||
7426 | 25154 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 02/01/1966 | ||
7427 | 25155 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 02/09/1966 | ||
7429 | 25156 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 05/09/1964 | ||
7430 | 25157 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 31/07/1965 | ||
7431 | 25158 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 06/08/1962 | ||
7432 | 25159 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 25/04/1964 | ||
7433 | 25160 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 24/06/1967 | ||
7434 | 25161 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 26/09/1965 | ||
7435 | 25162 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 31/12/1966 | ||
821 | 25163 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 03/10/1965 | ||
822 | 25164 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 05/03/1964 | ||
823 | 25165 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 04/07/1965 | ||
824 | 25166 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 21/01/1967 | ||
825 | 25167 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1944 | 16/07/1962 | ||
826 | 25168 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 14/03/1965 | ||
827 | 25169 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 03/05/1967 | ||
828 | 25170 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1944 | 24/06/1967 | ||
7301 | 25171 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 12/1954 | ||
7302 | 25172 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 16/05/1964 | ||
7303 | 25173 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 14/11/1965 | ||
7304 | 25174 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 07/1956 | ||
7305 | 25175 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 31/01/1965 | ||
7311 | 25176 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 21/12/1963 | ||
7312 | 25177 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 26/09/1965 | ||
7313 | 25178 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 02/09/1963 | ||
7314 | 25179 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 02/09/1966 | ||
7315 | 25180 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 24/05/1967 | ||
7316 | 25181 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 02/09/1963 | ||
7317 | 25182 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 17/08/1963 | ||
7318 | 25183 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 11/07/1965 | ||
7319 | 25184 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 02/01/1966 | ||
7320 | 25185 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 24/05/1967 | ||
7306 | 25186 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 07/08/1965 | ||
7307 | 25187 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 03/1965 | ||
7308 | 25188 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 04/1943 | 12/1956 | ||
7309 | 25189 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 24/03/1964 | ||
7310 | 25190 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 05/1943 | 11/04/1965 | ||
7321 | 25191 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 29/11/1963 | ||
7322 | 25192 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 10/04/1967 | ||
7323 | 25193 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 03/10/1965 | ||
7324 | 25194 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 09/09/1967 | ||
7325 | 25195 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 25/01/1964 | ||
7326 | 25196 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 16/03/1963 | ||
7327 | 25197 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 25/11/1963 | ||
7328 | 25198 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 09/01/1967 | ||
7329 | 25199 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 09/01/1966 | ||
7332 | 25200 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 24/06/1967 | ||
7333 | 25201 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 11/1949 | ||
7334 | 25202 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 09/08/1962 | ||
7335 | 25203 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 04/1964 | ||
7336 | 25204 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 01/09/1967 | ||
7337 | 25205 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 1965 | ||
7338 | 25206 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 04/1965 | ||
7339 | 25207 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 07/1943 | 06/02/1965 | ||
7330 | 25208 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 19/09/1965 | ||
7331 | 25209 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 06/1943 | 11/1949 | ||
7340 | 25210 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 12/11/1962 | ||
7341 | 25211 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 11/1949 | ||
7342 | 25212 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 07/11/1965 | ||
7343 | 25213 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 05/06/1966 | ||
7344 | 25214 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 11/1949 | ||
7345 | 25215 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 11/1949 | ||
7346 | 25216 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 11/1949 | ||
7347 | 25217 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 11/1949 | ||
7348 | 25218 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 23/12/1963 | ||
7349 | 25219 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 11/1949 | ||
7350 | 25220 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 24/03/1963 | ||
7351 | 25221 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1943 | 11/05/1963 | ||
7357 | 25222 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 24/06/1967 | ||
7353 | 25223 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 29/12/1962 | ||
7354 | 25224 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 18/05/1963 | ||
7358 | 25225 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 27/08/1962 | ||
7359 | 25226 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 07/1964 | ||
7360 | 25227 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 16/09/1963 | ||
7361 | 25228 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 11/1957 | ||
7362 | 25229 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 23/01/1966 | ||
7355 | 25230 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 31/01/1967 | ||
7363 | 25231 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 17/04/1966 | ||
7356 | 25232 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 26/12/1965 | ||
7388 | 25233 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1943 | 18/07/1965 | ||
7428 | 25234 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 08/08/1965 | ||
7364 | 25235 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 03/10/1965 | ||
7365 | 25236 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 02/09/1963 | ||
7366 | 25237 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 01/1954 | ||
7367 | 25238 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 17/12/1963 | ||
7368 | 25239 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1943 | 10/07/1965 | ||
7369 | 25240 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 05/09/1962 | ||
7370 | 25241 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 27/02/1966 | ||
7371 | 25242 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 24/06/1967 | ||
7372 | 25243 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 05/01/1964 | ||
7373 | 25244 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 01/08/1965 | ||
7374 | 25245 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 29/08/1964 | ||
7375 | 25247 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 24/06/1967 | ||
7376 | 25248 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 11/1949 | ||
7377 | 25249 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 09/1955 | ||
7378 | 25250 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 25/07/1965 | ||
7379 | 25251 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 13/03/1965 | ||
7380 | 25252 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 10/04/1965 | ||
7383 | 25253 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 09/1954 | ||
7381 | 25254 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 18/05/1963 | ||
7382 | 25255 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 09/12/1963 | ||
7384 | 25256 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1943 | 07/1957 | ||
7385 | 25257 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1943 | 18/05/1963 | ||
7386 | 25258 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1943 | 29/12/1962 | ||
7387 | 25259 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1943 | 09/1953 | ||
7390 | 25260 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1943 | 24/06/1967 | ||
7391 | 25261 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1943 | 27/02/1966 | ||
7392 | 25262 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1943 | 25/10/1965 | ||
25263 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 16/11/1943 | 02/01/1966 | |||
7394 | 25264 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1943 | 04/07/1965 | ||
7395 | 25265 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1943 | 28/02/1965 | ||
7396 | 25266 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1943 | 11/1949 | ||
7397 | 25267 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1943 | 25/05/1963 | ||
7398 | 25268 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1943 | 31/10/1965 | ||
7399 | 25269 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1943 | 29/12/1962 | ||
7400 | 25270 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1943 | 11/1957 | ||
7401 | 25271 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 27/06/1965 | ||
7402 | 25272 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 05/09/1965 | ||
7403 | 25273 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 02/1957 | ||
7404 | 25274 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 24/06/1967 | ||
7405 | 25275 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 12/1954 | ||
7406 | 25276 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 10/01/1965 | ||
25277 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 14/12/1943 | 03/10/1965 | |||
7417 | 25278 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 11/1955 | ||
7408 | 25279 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 06/03/1965 | ||
7409 | 25280 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 03/1955 | ||
7410 | 25281 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 05/09/1962 | ||
7411 | 25282 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 13/06/1965 | ||
7412 | 25283 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 27/02/1966 | ||
7413 | 25284 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 15/08/1962 | ||
7414 | 25285 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 29/12/1962 | ||
7415 | 25286 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 16/09/1962 | ||
7416 | 25287 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 21/11/1964 | ||
7418 | 25288 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 02/05/1965 | ||
7419 | 25289 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 06/02/1965 | ||
7420 | 25290 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 19/12/1965 | ||
7421 | 25291 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 17/10/1965 | ||
7422 | 25292 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 17/04/1966 | ||
7423 | 25293 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 01/08/1965 | ||
7436 | 25294 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 18/08/1964 | ||
7437 | 25295 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 10/01/1965 | ||
7438 | 25296 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 04/1955 | ||
7439 | 25297 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 29/12/1962 | ||
7440 | 25298 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 07/09/1964 | ||
7441 | 25299 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 06/03/1966 | ||
7442 | 25300 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 27/06/1965 | ||
7443 | 25301 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 29/12/1962 | ||
7444 | 25302 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 12/11/1962 | ||
7445 | 25303 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 01/07/1967 | ||
7446 | 25304 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 05/1956 | ||
7447 | 25305 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 19/12/1966 | ||
7448 | 25306 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 12/12/1965 | ||
7449 | 25307 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 18/08/1964 | ||
800 | 25308 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 01/12/1966 | ||
801 | 25309 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 21/12/1963 | ||
802 | 25310 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 25/04/1964 | ||
803 | 25311 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 09/1953 | ||
804 | 25312 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 27/10/1965 | ||
805 | 25313 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 20/08/1959 | ||
806 | 25314 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 05/1949 | ||
807 | 25315 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 24/04/1965 | ||
808 | 25316 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 21/11/1965 | ||
809 | 25317 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 26/12/1965 | ||
810 | 25318 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 23/03/1963 | ||
811 | 25319 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 13/03/1965 | ||
812 | 25320 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 11/1957 | ||
78560 | 25321 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 15/05/1967 | ||
78561 | 25322 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 25/04/1964 | ||
78562 | 25323 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 25/10/1962 | ||
78563 | 25324 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 19/12/1965 | ||
78564 | 25325 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 11/09/1966 | ||
78565 | 25326 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 25/07/1965 | ||
78566 | 25327 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 04/1955 | ||
78567 | 25328 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 02/1958 | ||
78568 | 25329 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 28/03/1964 | ||
78569 | 25330 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 04/07/1964 | ||
78570 | 25331 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 24/06/1967 | ||
78571 | 25332 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 01/1954 | ||
78572 | 25333 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 29/12/1962 | ||
78573 | 25334 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 11/1949 | ||
78574 | 25335 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 02/1957 | ||
78575 | 25336 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 13/02/1966 | ||
78576 | 25337 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 11/1949 | ||
78577 | 25338 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 11/10/1965 | ||
78578 | 25339 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 09/09/1967 | ||
78579 | 25340 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 09/1953 | ||
78580 | 25341 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 21/03/1966 | ||
25342 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 20/03/1966 | |||
25343 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 27/08/1962 | |||
25344 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 24/10/1965 | |||
25345 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 24/06/1967 | |||
25346 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 09/09/1967 | |||
78586 | 25347 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1944 | 12/1955 | ||
25348 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 18/04/1965 | |||
25349 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 27/02/1966 | |||
78589 | 25350 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1944 | 11/1949 | ||
25351 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 02/1967 | |||
25352 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 15/06/1963 | |||
25353 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 22/04/1967 | |||
78593 | 25354 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1944 | 07/1956 | ||
25355 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 02/08/1962 | |||
25356 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 11/07/1964 | |||
25357 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 31/10/1964 | |||
25358 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 19/09/1965 | |||
25359 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 30/08/1962 | |||
25360 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 05/12/1964 | |||
25361 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 22/08/1965 | |||
25362 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 21/04/1964 | |||
25363 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 28/10/1966 | |||
25364 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 19/09/1965 | |||
25365 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 24/06/1967 | |||
25366 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 11/05/1967 | |||
25367 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 04/07/1965 | |||
25368 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 16/12/1944 | 27/03/1965 | |||
25369 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 05/08/1963 | |||
25370 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 02/12/1963 | |||
25371 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 14/11/1965 | |||
78611 | 25372 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1944 | 10/1957 | ||
25373 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 28/03/1964 | |||
78613 | 25374 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1944 | 12/1953 | ||
25375 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 04/1964 | |||
78615 | 25376 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 08/06/1967 | ||
78616 | 25377 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 30/09/1967 | ||
78617 | 25378 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 09/1953 | ||
78618 | 25379 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 01/1954 | ||
78619 | 25380 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 09/1955 | ||
78620 | 25381 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 10/1956 | ||
78621 | 25382 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 24/06/1967 | ||
78622 | 25383 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 01/1954 | ||
78623 | 25384 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 09/1953 | ||
78624 | 25385 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 12/05/1967 | ||
78531 | 25386 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 28/03/1964 | ||
78532 | 25387 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 24/06/1967 | ||
78533 | 25388 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 01/1954 | ||
78534 | 25389 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 10/11/1964 | ||
78535 | 25390 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1945 | 09/1955 | ||
78536 | 25391 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1945 | 03/1956 | ||
78537 | 25392 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1945 | 17/04/1966 | ||
78538 | 25393 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1945 | 18/08/1964 | ||
78539 | 25394 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1945 | 12/1954 | ||
78540 | 25395 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1945 | 24/06/1967 | ||
78541 | 25396 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1945 | 26/10/1964 | ||
78542 | 25397 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1945 | 12/02/1966 | ||
78543 | 25398 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1945 | 29/12/1962 | ||
78544 | 25399 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1945 | 15/01/1967 | ||
78545 | 25400 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1945 | 03/1953 | ||
78546 | 25401 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1945 | 04/1964 | ||
78547 | 25402 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1945 | 09/1953 | ||
78548 | 25403 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1945 | 09/1953 | ||
78549 | 25404 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1945 | 11/1949 | ||
78550 | 25405 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1945 | 13/01/1964 | ||
78551 | 25406 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1945 | 09/09/1967 | ||
78552 | 25407 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1945 | 07/1957 | ||
78553 | 25408 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1945 | 16/01/1966 | ||
78554 | 25409 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1945 | 11/04/1965 | ||
78555 | 25410 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1945 | 04/1955 | ||
868 | 25411 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 11/1949 | ||
78556 | 25411 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1945 | 06/1965 | ||
870 | 25412 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 08/1944 | 27/02/1966 | ||
8510 | 25412 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 24/06/1967 | ||
78557 | 25412 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1945 | 11/1949 | ||
8515 | 25413 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 06/06/1965 | ||
78558 | 25413 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1945 | 09/1953 | ||
8516 | 25414 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 16/05/1965 | ||
78559 | 25414 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1945 | 01/08/1965 | ||
78518 | 25415 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 09/1953 | ||
78519 | 25416 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 07/1956 | ||
78520 | 25417 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 12/08/1963 | ||
78521 | 25418 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 18/01/1964 | ||
78522 | 25419 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 27/02/1966 | ||
78523 | 25420 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 05/1956 | ||
78524 | 25421 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 02/1954 | ||
78525 | 25422 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 20/06/1965 | ||
78526 | 25423 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 17/04/1966 | ||
8517 | 25424 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 09/1944 | 07/1957 | ||
78527 | 25425 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 09/01/1967 | ||
78528 | 25426 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 30/05/1963 | ||
78529 | 25427 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 10/1944 | 01/1973 | ||
78530 | 25428 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1944 | 11/1955 |