Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 03/1943 |
For | 50 Steam locomotives |
Class | WD/10 |
Information | Hyde Park |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
73750 | 25596 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 03/1945 | 04/1951 | ||
73751 | 25597 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 03/1945 | 10/1951 | ||
73752 | 25598 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 04/1945 | 06/1951 | ||
73753 | 25599 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 04/1945 | 11/1950 | ||
73754 | 25600 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 04/1945 | 09/1951 | ||
73755 | 25601 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 04/1945 | 05/1951 | ||
73756 | 25602 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 04/1945 | 08/1951 | ||
73757 | 25603 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 04/1945 | 09/1949 | ||
73758 | 25604 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 04/1945 | 01/1951 | ||
73759 | 25605 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 04/1945 | 02/1951 | ||
73760 | 25606 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 04/1945 | 02/1950 | ||
73761 | 25607 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 05/1945 | 05/1951 | ||
73762 | 25608 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 05/1945 | 11/1951 | ||
73763 | 25609 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 05/1945 | 02/1951 | ||
73764 | 25610 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 05/1945 | 04/1952 | ||
73765 | 25611 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 05/1945 | 08/1951 | ||
73766 | 25612 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 05/1945 | 11/1951 | ||
73767 | 25613 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 05/1945 | 03/1951 | ||
73768 | 25614 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 05/1945 | 02/1950 | ||
73769 | 25615 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 05/1945 | 02/1951 | ||
73770 | 25616 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 05/1945 | 02/1952 | ||
73771 | 25617 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 05/1945 | 09/1951 | ||
73772 | 25618 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 05/1945 | 11/1951 | ||
73773 | 25619 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 05/1945 | 01/1950 | ||
73774 | 25620 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 06/1945 | 09/05/1962 | ||
73775 | 25621 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 06/1945 | 29/12/1962 | ||
73776 | 25622 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 06/1945 | 19/12/1961 | ||
73777 | 25623 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 06/1945 | 06/07/1961 | ||
73778 | 25624 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 06/1945 | 06/07/1961 | ||
73779 | 25625 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 06/1945 | 29/12/1962 | ||
73780 | 25626 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 06/1945 | 29/12/1962 | ||
73781 | 25627 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 06/1945 | 29/12/1962 | ||
73782 | 25628 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 06/1945 | 29/12/1962 | ||
73783 | 25629 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 06/1945 | 29/12/1962 | ||
73784 | 25630 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 06/1945 | 09/05/1962 | ||
73785 | 25631 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 06/1945 | 29/11/1962 | ||
73786 | 25632 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 06/1945 | 29/12/1962 | ||
73787 | 25633 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 06/1945 | 29/12/1962 | ||
73788 | 25634 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 07/1945 | 09/05/1962 | ||
73789 | 25635 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 07/1945 | 17/12/1962 | ||
73790 | 25636 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 07/1945 | 29/12/1962 | ||
73791 | 25637 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 07/1945 | 29/12/1962 | ||
73792 | 25638 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 07/1945 | 30/07/1962 | ||
73793 | 25639 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 08/1945 | 29/12/1962 | ||
73794 | 25640 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 08/1945 | 29/12/1962 | ||
73795 | 25641 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 08/1945 | 29/12/1962 | ||
73796 | 25642 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 08/1945 | 29/12/1962 | ||
73797 | 25643 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 08/1945 | 1967 | ||
73798 | 25644 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 08/1945 | 29/12/1962 | ||
73799 | 25645 | WD/10 | WD | 2-10-0 | 08/1945 | 13/12/1962 |