Manufacturer: North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Builder | North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Date | 1929 |
For | 25 Steam locomotives |
Class | 57xx |
Administration | Swindon Works order #264 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
7725 | 23921 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/1929 | 29/08/1960 | |
7726 | 23922 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/1929 | 19/08/1960 | |
7727 | 23923 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/1929 | 04/01/1960 | |
7728 | 23924 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/1929 | 10/05/1960 | |
7729 | 23925 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/1929 | 13/07/1962 | |
7730 | 23926 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/1929 | 23/03/1959 | |
7731 | 23927 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/1929 | 06/04/1959 | |
7732 | 23928 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/1929 | 15/10/1962 | |
7733 | 23929 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/1929 | 28/05/1960 | |
7734 | 23930 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/1929 | 14/04/1959 | |
7735 | 23931 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/1929 | 11/05/1959 | |
7736 | 23932 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 12/1929 | 14/05/1962 | |
7737 | 23933 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/1930 | 28/03/1960 | |
7738 | 23934 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/1930 | 16/02/1959 | |
7739 | 23935 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/1930 | 04/11/1962 | |
7740 | 23936 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 01/1930 | 23/12/1960 | |
7741 | 23937 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1930 | 03/12/1961 | |
7742 | 23938 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1930 | 13/07/1959 | |
7743 | 23939 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1930 | 10/08/1959 | |
7744 | 23940 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1930 | 27/09/1962 | |
7745 | 23941 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1930 | 22/03/1961 | |
7746 | 23942 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1930 | 19/10/1959 | |
7747 | 23943 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1930 | 06/02/1961 | |
7748 | 23944 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1930 | 27/04/1961 | |
7749 | 23945 | 57xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-0PT | 02/1930 | 09/09/1962 |