Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 788 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 5260 Week
» 24161 Month
» 24161 Year
» 1689537 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Neilson, Reid & Co.



Order Details for Lot No: NS/E711
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Date 1893
For 6 Steam locomotives
Class D41

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
78 4640 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 12/1893 20/02/1953  
79 4641 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 12/1893 07/1946  
80 4642 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 12/1893 19/03/1951  
81 4643 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 12/1893 05/02/1952  
82 4644 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 12/1893 17/12/1951  
83 4645 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 12/1893 18/03/1952