Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 43 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5654 Week
» 16700 Month
» 16700 Year
» 1682076 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Neilson, Reid & Co.



Order Details for Lot No: NS/E747
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Date 1895
For 14 Steam locomotives
Class D41

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
93 4877 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 12/1895 12/1946  
94 4878 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 12/1895 27/08/1948  
95 4879 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 12/1895 31/12/1947  
96 4880 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 12/1895 29/10/1949  
97 4881 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 12/1895 23/02/1953  
98 4882 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 12/1895 23/02/1953  
99 4883 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 12/1895 16/01/1951  
100 4884 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 02/1896 07/1947  
19 4885 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 02/1896 21/11/1952  
20 4886 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 02/1896 16/10/1951  
21 4887 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 02/1896 09/1946  
22 4888 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 02/1896 10/11/1949  
23 4889 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 03/1896 27/05/1950  
24 4890 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 03/1896 12/1947