Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 167 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4513 Week
» 4513 Month
» 71375 Year
» 1736751 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Neilson, Reid & Co.



Order Details for Lot No: NS/E787
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Date 1897
For 12 Steam locomotives
Class D41

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
101 5212 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 09/1897 12/1947  
102 5213 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 09/1897 22/08/1951  
103 5214 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 09/1897 20/10/1950  
104 5215 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 09/1897 13/10/1952  
105 5216 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 09/1897 10/10/1950  
106 5217 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 09/1897 12/1947  
107 5218 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 02/1898 18/06/1951  
108 5219 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 02/1898 09/11/1951  
109 5220 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 02/1898 01/1947  
110 5221 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 02/1898 01/1947  
111 5222 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 02/1898 27/05/1952  
112 5223 D41 GNSR Johnson 4-4-0 02/1898 02/12/1952