Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 23 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2949 Week
» 4687 Month
» 132130 Year
» 1797506 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd



Order Details for Lot No: RS/E104
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Date 1917
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class O4
Information Order placed by the Ministry of Munitions in aid of the War effort

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1651 3695 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1917 04/06/1964  
1652 3696 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 09/1917 09/09/1941  
1653 3697 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1917 05/12/1963  
1654 3698 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1917 08/05/1959  
1655 3699 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1917 15/01/1966  
1656 3700 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 10/1917 15/01/1966  
1657 3701 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1917 24/11/1962  
1658 3702 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1917 05/10/1941  
1659 3703 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 11/1917 19/09/1941  
1661 3705 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1917 23/05/1965  
1662 3706 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1917 27/09/1941  
1663 3707 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1917 24/02/1962  
1664 3708 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 12/1917 06/03/1959  
1665 3709 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1918 20/09/1941  
1666 3710 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1918 14/09/1941  
1667 3711 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 01/1918 31/03/1964  
1668 3712 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1918 15/09/1962  
1669 3713 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1918 16/10/1963  
1670 3714 O4 GCR Robinson 2-8-0 02/1918 26/09/1965