Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 107 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3496 Week
» 22397 Month
» 22397 Year
» 1687773 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd



Order Details for Lot No: RS/RS223
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Date 1909
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J27

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1049 3352 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 04/1909 18/03/1963  
1050 3353 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 04/1909 13/02/1966  
1053 3354 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1909 27/03/1966  
1056 3355 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1909 01/05/1967  
1060 3356 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 06/1909 24/05/1967  
1061 3357 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 07/1909 23/01/1967  
1064 3358 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 07/1909 13/04/1959  
1065 3359 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 09/1909 30/10/1962  
1066 3360 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 09/1909 23/01/1967  
1067 3361 J27 NER Worsdell 0-6-0 09/1909 22/01/1962