Manufacturer: Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Builder | Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Date | 1952 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 94xx |
Information | Subcontracted by Hudswell Clarke |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
8480 | 1827 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 26/03/1952 | 06/07/1964 | |
8481 | 1828 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 31/03/1952 | 03/06/1965 | |
8482 | 1829 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 15/04/1952 | 12/09/1962 | |
8483 | 1830 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 23/05/1952 | 13/02/1962 | |
8484 | 1831 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 31/05/1952 | 03/06/1965 | |
8485 | 1832 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 13/06/1952 | 22/06/1959 | |
8486 | 1833 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 30/06/1952 | 16/06/1965 | |
8487 | 1834 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 02/07/1952 | 22/11/1963 | |
8488 | 1835 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 31/07/1952 | 07/05/1965 | |
8489 | 1836 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 25/07/1952 | 09/02/1962 | |
8490 | 1837 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 29/07/1952 | 05/10/1962 | |
8491 | 1838 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 20/08/1952 | 23/07/1963 | |
8492 | 1839 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 21/08/1952 | 15/06/1959 | |
8493 | 1840 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 30/09/1952 | 06/11/1964 | |
8494 | 1841 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 05/09/1952 | 23/01/1962 | |
8495 | 1842 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 31/10/1952 | 06/11/1964 | |
8496 | 1843 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 03/10/1952 | 23/07/1963 | |
8497 | 1844 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 07/11/1952 | 06/07/1964 | |
8498 | 1845 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 30/11/1952 | 03/06/1965 | |
8499 | 1846 | 94xx | GWR | Hawksworth | 0-6-0PT | 10/11/1952 | 21/06/1962 |