Manufacturer: St. Rollox Works
Builder | St. Rollox Works |
Order Date | 1899 |
For | 17 Steam locomotives |
Class | 812 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
812 | 812 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 05/1899 | 29/12/1962 | ||
813 | 812 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 05/1899 | 17/07/1948 | ||
814 | 812 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 05/1899 | 18/12/1959 | ||
815 | 812 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 06/1899 | 23/10/1959 | ||
816 | 812 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 06/1899 | 06/1960 | ||
817 | 812 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 06/1899 | 15/11/1962 | ||
818 | 812 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 06/1899 | 10/04/1958 | ||
819 | 812 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 06/1899 | 09/1962 | ||
820 | 812 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 06/1899 | 16/09/1960 | ||
821 | 812 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 07/1899 | 02/10/1961 | ||
822 | 812 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 07/1899 | 02/10/1961 | ||
823 | 812 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 07/1899 | 07/1949 | ||
824 | 812 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 07/1899 | 21/05/1962 | ||
825 | 812 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 07/1899 | 11/12/1961 | ||
826 | 812 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 08/1899 | 02/10/1961 | ||
827 | 812 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 08/1899 | 29/12/1962 | ||
828 | 812 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 08/1899 | 08/08/1963 |