Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 596 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5315 Week
» 16460 Month
» 116245 Year
» 1781621 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Sharp Stewart



Order Details for Lot No: SS/SS2283
Builder Sharp Stewart
Order Date 1900
For 15 Steam locomotives
Class 812

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
849 4634 812 CR McIntosh 0-6-0 08/1900 16/07/1962  
850 4635 812 CR McIntosh 0-6-0 08/1900 17/01/1958  
851 4636 812 CR McIntosh 0-6-0 08/1900 19/10/1956  
852 4637 812 CR McIntosh 0-6-0 08/1900 16/09/1963  
853 4638 812 CR McIntosh 0-6-0 08/1900 20/06/1961  
854 4639 812 CR McIntosh 0-6-0 08/1900 12/08/1963  
855 4640 812 CR McIntosh 0-6-0 08/1900 20/11/1961  
856 4641 812 CR McIntosh 0-6-0 08/1900 29/12/1962  
857 4642 812 CR McIntosh 0-6-0 08/1900 20/11/1959  
858 4643 812 CR McIntosh 0-6-0 08/1900 01/10/1962  
859 4644 812 CR McIntosh 0-6-0 08/1900 02/04/1962  
860 4645 812 CR McIntosh 0-6-0 08/1900 10/1946  
861 4646 812 CR McIntosh 0-6-0 08/1900 05/11/1959  
862 4647 812 CR McIntosh 0-6-0 08/1900 29/11/1963  
863 4648 812 CR McIntosh 0-6-0 08/1900 29/12/1962