Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 519 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6698 Week
» 10592 Month
» 110377 Year
» 1775753 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Sharp Stewart



Order Details for Lot No: SS/SS394
Builder Sharp Stewart
Order Date 1899
For 25 Steam locomotives
Class J52

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1226 4471 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 04/1899 10/08/1953  
1227 4472 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 04/1899 11/03/1957  
1228 4473 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 04/1899 03/01/1956  
1229 4474 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 04/1899 03/02/1958  
1230 4475 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 04/1899 10/02/1958  
1231 4476 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 04/1899 13/07/1956  
1232 4477 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 04/1899 20/01/1959  
1233 4478 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 04/1899 21/10/1957  
1234 4479 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 04/1899 20/02/1956  
1235 4480 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 04/1899 22/02/1960  
1236 4481 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 04/1899 10/02/1958  
1237 4482 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 04/1899 03/10/1956  
1238 4483 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 04/1899 23/02/1959  
1239 4484 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 04/1899 07/08/1956  
1240 4485 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 04/1899 12/04/1958  
1241 4486 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 05/1899 27/01/1958  
1242 4487 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 05/1899 01/04/1957  
1243 4488 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 05/1899 26/07/1958  
1244 4489 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 05/1899 22/04/1957  
1245 4490 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 05/1899 25/10/1954  
1246 4491 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 05/1899 02/1958  
1247 4492 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 05/1899 08/05/1959  
1248 4493 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 05/1899 01/08/1958  
1249 4494 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 05/1899 24/07/1958  
1250 4495 J52 GNR Stirling 0-6-0ST 05/1899 16/12/1957