Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 435 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6614 Week
» 10508 Month
» 110293 Year
» 1775669 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Sharp Stewart



Order Details for Lot No: SS/SS470
Builder Sharp Stewart
Order Date 1901
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class J83

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
815 4723 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 04/1901 09/1947  
816 4724 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 04/1901 24/11/1958  
817 4725 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 04/1901 10/03/1958  
818 4726 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 04/1901 12/08/1957  
819 4727 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 04/1901 23/12/1958  
820 4728 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 04/1901 02/09/1959  
821 4729 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 04/1901 18/06/1959  
822 4730 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 04/1901 05/10/1956  
823 4731 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 04/1901 08/10/1962  
824 4732 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 04/1901 04/08/1961  
825 4733 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 04/1901 12/02/1962  
826 4734 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 04/1901 26/05/1956  
827 4735 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 04/1901 18/04/1958  
828 4736 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 05/1901 10/03/1958  
829 4737 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 05/1901 16/03/1956  
830 4738 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 05/1901 29/12/1962  
831 4739 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 05/1901 24/11/1958  
832 4740 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 05/1901 08/10/1962  
833 4741 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 05/1901 12/03/1959  
834 4742 J83 NBR Holmes 0-6-0T 05/1901 12/02/1962