Manufacturer: Sharp Stewart
Builder | Sharp Stewart |
Order Date | 1901 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | J83 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 4723 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 04/1901 | 09/1947 | |
816 | 4724 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 04/1901 | 24/11/1958 | |
817 | 4725 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 04/1901 | 10/03/1958 | |
818 | 4726 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 04/1901 | 12/08/1957 | |
819 | 4727 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 04/1901 | 23/12/1958 | |
820 | 4728 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 04/1901 | 02/09/1959 | |
821 | 4729 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 04/1901 | 18/06/1959 | |
822 | 4730 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 04/1901 | 05/10/1956 | |
823 | 4731 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 04/1901 | 08/10/1962 | |
824 | 4732 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 04/1901 | 04/08/1961 | |
825 | 4733 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 04/1901 | 12/02/1962 | |
826 | 4734 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 04/1901 | 26/05/1956 | |
827 | 4735 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 04/1901 | 18/04/1958 | |
828 | 4736 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 05/1901 | 10/03/1958 | |
829 | 4737 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 05/1901 | 16/03/1956 | |
830 | 4738 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 05/1901 | 29/12/1962 | |
831 | 4739 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 05/1901 | 24/11/1958 | |
832 | 4740 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 05/1901 | 08/10/1962 | |
833 | 4741 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 05/1901 | 12/03/1959 | |
834 | 4742 | J83 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0T | 05/1901 | 12/02/1962 |