Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/A26
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 09/1890
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J67
Information Shunting

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
397   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 11/1890 22/03/1954  
398   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 11/1890 28/09/1959  
399   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 11/1890 14/12/1956  
400   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 11/1890 01/04/1957  
401   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 11/1890 18/10/1960  
402   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 11/1890 05/1937  
403   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 12/1890 25/07/1955  
404   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 12/1890 05/1937  
405   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 12/1890 09/01/1957  
406   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 12/1890 07/1937