Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 521 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3447 Week
» 5185 Month
» 132628 Year
» 1798004 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/A64
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 01/1908
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class D15

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1830   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 03/1908 10/02/1958  
1831   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 03/1908 22/10/1957  
1832   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 03/1908 06/08/1948  
1833   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 04/1908 24/03/1958  
1834   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 04/1908 01/01/1957  
1835   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 05/1908 02/12/1958  
1836   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 05/1908 17/12/1956  
1837   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 06/1908 28/04/1958  
1838   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 07/1908 26/11/1956  
1839   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 07/1908 24/11/1959