Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 69 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4561 Week
» 29395 Month
» 63727 Year
» 1729103 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/A65
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1908
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class F4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
180   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1908 13/12/1954  
181   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1908 11/1935  
182   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 12/1908 01/1931  
183   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 12/1908 10/1934  
184   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 12/1908 01/08/1951  
185   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 01/1909 22/07/1953  
186   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 01/1909 12/03/1951  
187   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 02/1909 18/08/1952  
188   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 02/1909 21/11/1955  
189   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 02/1909 24/04/1948