Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 32 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4659 Week
» 6397 Month
» 133840 Year
» 1799216 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/A71
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1911
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class F6

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 10/1911 13/05/1958  
2   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 10/1911 14/03/1958  
3   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1911 14/11/1955  
4   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1911 13/12/1955  
5   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1911 17/08/1956  
6   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 12/1911 16/01/1956  
7   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 12/1911 17/08/1955  
8   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 01/1912 08/1953  
9   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 01/1912 07/11/1955  
10   F6 GER Holden 2-4-2T 01/1912 30/12/1955