Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 544 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3470 Week
» 5208 Month
» 132651 Year
» 1798027 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/A73
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 01/1913
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class B12

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1505   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 02/1913 25/03/1952  
1507   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 03/1913 26/02/1953  
1508   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 03/1913 30/04/1953  
1509   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 04/1913 15/10/1948  
1510   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 04/1913 06/1949  
1511   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 05/1913 05/05/1952  
1512   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 06/1913 01/01/1957  
1513   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 06/1913 18/02/1953  
1514   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 06/1913 07/10/1959