Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 33 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4660 Week
» 6398 Month
» 133841 Year
» 1799217 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/A81
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1920
For 5 Steam locomotives
Class J19

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1250   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 09/1920 24/11/1959  
1251   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 10/1920 11/02/1962  
1252   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 10/1920 01/01/1959  
1253   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 10/1920 06/08/1962  
1254   J19 GER Hill 0-6-0 11/1920 16/01/1961