Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 15 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4642 Week
» 6380 Month
» 133823 Year
» 1799199 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/B66
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 04/1909
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class D15

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1820   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 06/1909 01/01/1959  
1821   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 06/1909 28/07/1958  
1822   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 09/1909 24/10/1955  
1823   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 11/1909 05/12/1955  
1824   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 11/1909 29/05/1957  
1825   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 11/1909 09/09/1957  
1826   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 12/1909 10/1956  
1827   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 12/1909 21/10/1957  
1828   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 12/1909 07/03/1955  
1829   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 12/1909 09/06/1958