Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 599 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3525 Week
» 5263 Month
» 132706 Year
» 1798082 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/B70
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1912
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J15

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
562   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 02/1912 05/09/1962  
563   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 02/1912 14/04/1960  
564   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 03/1912 16/09/1962  
565   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 03/1912 18/11/1959  
566   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 03/1912 16/09/1962  
567   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 03/1912 16/09/1962  
568   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 04/1912 28/07/1958  
569   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 04/1912 03/02/1959  
570   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1912 30/09/1959  
571   J15 GER Worsdell 0-6-0 05/1912 01/08/1962