Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 591 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3517 Week
» 5255 Month
» 132698 Year
» 1798074 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/B78
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 01/1915
For 5 Steam locomotives
Class B12

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1536   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 05/1915 30/12/1949  
1537   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 07/1915 22/04/1957  
1538   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 07/1915 01/01/1957  
1539   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 06/1917 10/11/1954  
1540   B12 GER Holden 4-6-0 07/1917 28/10/1957