Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 35 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4662 Week
» 6400 Month
» 133843 Year
» 1799219 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/C37
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 02/1896
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J67
Information Passenger

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
265   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1896 01/08/1960  
266   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1896 19/01/1959  
267   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1896 06/10/1960  
268   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 04/1896 12/03/1958  
269   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1896 10/11/1960  
270   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1896 16/01/1961  
271   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 05/1896 18/01/1960  
272   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 06/1896 10/1940  
273   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 06/1896 28/09/1959  
274   J67 GER Holden 0-6-0T 06/1896 10/1940