Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 977 Today
» 1177 Yesterday
» 3283 Week
» 28117 Month
» 62449 Year
» 1727825 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/C59
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1905
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class F4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
101   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1905 11/1929  
102   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1905 02/1931  
103   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1905 06/12/1955  
104   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1905 10/01/1957  
105   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1905 03/1935  
106   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1905 02/1933  
107   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 02/1906 12/1929  
108   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 01/1906 18/02/1957  
109   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 02/1906 04/07/1955  
110   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 01/1906 10/1956