Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 582 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3508 Week
» 5246 Month
» 132689 Year
» 1798065 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/C72
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 04/1912
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class J68
Information Passenger Engines

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
41   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 06/1912 10/1940  
42   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 06/1912 24/02/1959  
43   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 06/1912 17/04/1959  
44   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 07/1912 22/04/1959  
45   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 07/1912 06/11/1959  
46   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 08/1912 10/09/1961  
47   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 08/1912 16/11/1959  
48   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 09/1912 28/11/1960  
49   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 09/1912 06/11/1959  
50   J68 GER Hill 0-6-0T 09/1912 10/09/1961