Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 602 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3528 Week
» 5266 Month
» 132709 Year
» 1798085 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/D58
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1904
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class F4

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
781   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 10/1904 10/1956  
782   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1904 06/05/1958  
783   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1904 07/03/1955  
784   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1904 14/03/1955  
785   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1904 15/08/1955  
786   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1904 05/02/1957  
787   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1904 20/12/1957  
788   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 11/1904 17/12/1956  
789   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 12/1904 10/03/1958  
790   F4 GER Holden 2-4-2T 12/1904 06/11/1956