Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 498 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3424 Week
» 5162 Month
» 132605 Year
» 1797981 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/D67
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 01/1910
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class D15

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1810   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 03/1910 09/03/1953  
1811   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 03/1910 01/01/1959  
1812   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 03/1910 23/11/1948  
1813   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 04/1910 23/12/1957  
1814   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 04/1910 11/04/1955  
1815   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 05/1910 05/03/1958  
1816   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 06/1910 17/12/1956  
1817   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 06/1910 13/10/1958  
1818   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 06/1910 18/05/1959  
1819   D15 GER Holden 4-4-0 06/1910 28/01/1952