Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 35 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4662 Week
» 6400 Month
» 133843 Year
» 1799219 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/D81
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 01/1920
Class J20

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1270   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 04/1920 14/12/1959  
1271   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 12/1920 10/09/1961  
1272   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 12/1920 10/09/1961  
1273   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 12/1920 23/09/1960  
1274   J20 GER Hill 0-6-0 12/1920 13/01/1961